Case: 11-94-00183-CV
11-94-00183-CV
12/01/1994
Divorce
Arnold, Barney B.
Eaton, Sue Arnold
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/2003 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
02/09/1996 | Mandate issued | | |
12/31/1995 | Yearly opinion book | | |
12/07/1995 | Mot. - For rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
11/27/1995 | Mot. - For rehearing filed | | |
11/09/1995 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
10/04/1995 | Supp. TR filed | | |
09/29/1995 | We send letter to lawyers, etc. | | |
09/22/1995 | Additonal Authorities | | |
09/11/1995 | Additonal Authorities | | |
09/07/1995 | Submitted | | |
09/07/1995 | Submission set in Eastland | | |
08/11/1995 | Submission set in Eastland | | |
05/18/1995 | Cancellation of submission date | | |
05/18/1995 | Mot. - for postponement disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/27/1995 | Mot. - to postpone filed | | |
04/11/1995 | Submission set in Eastland | | |
04/07/1995 | Brief filed | | |
04/07/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/16/1995 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/03/1995 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |
02/10/1995 | Phone call - we receive from lawyers, etc. | | |
02/09/1995 | Brief filed | | |
01/12/1995 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/03/1995 | Mot. - Ext. to file brief | | |
12/08/1994 | SF filed | | |
12/07/1994 | Filing fee paid | | |
12/01/1994 | Filing fee not paid - possible dismissal | | |
12/01/1994 | TR filed | | |
12/01/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/09/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Eaton, Sue Arnold | Appellee | Sam J. Chase |
Arnold, Barney B. | Appellant | Chad Williams |
Trial Court Information
259th District Court
Jones
Honorable Quay F. Parker, Senior Judge
13,708