judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Wilkerson, Fred John v. Texas, The State of

Case: 02-81-00353-CR
02-81-00353-CR
11/30/1981
Marijuana Possession
Wilkerson, Fred John
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
05/25/1983Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
03/09/1983Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
02/09/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/01/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Tarrant
Honorable Ira Sam Houston
27680
3 yrs. Prob.