Case Information: 38888 | |||
Short Caption: | JONES VS. DISTRICT COURT (NUSTAD) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 39971 , 42395 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CV0108118 White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CF0011021 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/07/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
12/07/2001 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. "First Amendment Petition" for Writ of Mandamus Pursuant to NRS 34.185 and 34.160. | 01-20576 | |
12/07/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
01/03/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn3[It is not clear from the documents before this court which district court department(s) is/are assigned to the underlying district court cases. We direct the clerk of this court to serve a copy of this order on both departments of the Seventh Judicial District Court.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-00165 | |
01/29/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 02-00584 | |
01/29/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/20/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On January 3, 2002, we entered an order denying this proper person writ petition. On January 24, 2002, petitioner submitted a letter in which he asked about the status of the petition, and noted that his address had changed. fn1[Although petitioner was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from him.] It appears that petitioner may not have received a copy of this court's January 3, 2002, order. We direct the clerk of this court to serve a copy of the order on petitioner at the address stated in his letter. To the extent that petitioner requests any additional relief in his letter, it is denied as moot in light of our January 3 order. | 02-03265 |