Case Information: 38871 | |||
Short Caption: | HAIN VS. KOLL MGMT. SERVICES | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40812 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A387836 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/12/2001 / Mendoza, John | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/03/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
12/03/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-20241 | |
12/03/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
12/03/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
12/10/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Don C. Tingey - check no. 4783. | ||
12/10/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Posting Filing Fee with Supreme Court. | 01-20706 | |
12/10/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Submission of Judgments and Orders Appealed and Certification Order Directing Entry of Judgment Pursuant to NRCP 54(b). | 01-20783 | |
12/12/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John F. Mendoza. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
12/14/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. John F. Mendoza. | ||
12/17/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 12/11/01. | 01-21250 | |
01/22/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement and motion for extension of time due: 10 days. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | ||
01/31/2002 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 02-02113 | |
01/31/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. For Docketing Statement filed on 01/31/02. Due date: 5 days. | ||
02/01/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. John F. Mendoza. (Docketing statement) | ||
02/11/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 10, 2002. | 02-02693 | |
02/15/2002 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from attorney Bruce Tingey. In regard to the proof of service required on the docketing statement, only attorney Cory Jones is involved in this appeal. Attorneys Ericsson, Krudziel and Nitz are not involved. | 02-03055 | |
02/22/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. (Deleted Thrifty Payless, Astro Floor Care and H.D. Lounsbury as respondents.) | ||
04/24/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 02-07249 | |
05/08/2002 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 02-08065 | |
06/05/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due: 30 days. We caution appellant that failure to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction may result in this court's dismissal of this appeal. The preparation of transcripts and the briefing schedule in the appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date the appellant's response is served. | 02-09821 | |
08/22/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 02-14368 | |
09/18/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-14935 | |
09/18/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/30/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 20, 2002. | 02-14935 |