Case Information: 38877 | |||
Short Caption: | ATTORNEY GENERAL VS. BOARD OF REGENTS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0001632A | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/10/2001 / Eisenberg, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | 02/11/2003 at 9:00 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 02/11/2003 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/04/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/04/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-20300 | |
12/10/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert L. Eisenberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
12/19/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-21402 | |
12/21/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Robert L. Eisenberg. | ||
01/31/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties will report to the settlement judge within 10 days regarding certain matters, and the settlement judge will then decide whether future settlement proceedings will be held. | 02-02094 | |
02/13/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 02-02866 | |
02/22/2002 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 02-03395 | |
03/08/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 02-04261 | |
06/21/2002 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 06/21/02. | 02-10809 | |
06/21/2002 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. | 02-10810 | |
07/17/2002 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | 02-12278 | |
07/19/2002 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The stipulation filed on July 17, 2002 is treated as a joint motion for an extension of time. Respondents shall have until September 9, 2002, to file and serve the answering brief. | 02-12426 | |
08/29/2002 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 08/29/02. | 02-15028 | |
09/27/2002 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 31, 2002. | 02-16741 | |
10/31/2002 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 10/31/02. | 02-18768 | |
12/10/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on February 11, 2003, at 9:00 a.m. (En Banc) | ||
01/27/2003 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | ||
02/11/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Order Modifying Caption. The clerk of this court shall modify the caption in this appeal by substituting "Brian Sandoval, Attorney General of the State of Nevada," as appellant in the place of "Frankie Sue Del Papa, Attorney General of the State of Nevada." | 03-02396 | |
02/11/2003 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. EN BANC | ||
05/02/2003 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and Remanded." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Per Curiam. 119 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. EN BANC. | 03-07420 | |
05/27/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-07648 | |
05/27/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/05/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 29, 2003. | 03-07648 |