judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RALPH S. LANE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-1437
Short Caption:RALPH S. LANE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead:80-CF-1437Consolidated: 82-CF-0272
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2452-79Filed Date:12/01/1980

Opening Event Date:12/01/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/03/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/27/1982
Argued/Submitted:04/06/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRalph S. Lane N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LANE, RALPH S. UNITED STATES
12/01/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/03/1982FiledRecord Completed
12/27/1982FiledBriefing Completed
04/06/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/18/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition