Case: PD-0116-90
PD-0116-90
01/29/1990
PDR Case Type
JACKSON, THADDEUS FAVIAN AKA JACKSON, CHARLES EDWARD
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/10/1990 | WRIT OF CERT USSC | Filed | |
05/15/1990 | STAY MANDAT MOT TO | DENIED | |
05/14/1990 | STAY MANDAT MOT TO | Filed | |
04/25/1990 | FINAL DISP/REHEAR | Refused | |
04/25/1990 | REHEAR DISP | DENIED | |
04/06/1990 | REHEAR FILED | | |
03/28/1990 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
03/01/1990 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
01/29/1990 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/27/1990 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
JACKSON, THADDEUS FAVIAN AKA J | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | George O. Jacobs |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John Holmes |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-88-00291-CR
Aff 10-26-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable CARL WALKER, JR.
486913