Case Heading (S-12-0153) | |||||
Case Number: | S-12-0153 | Case Docketed On: | 07/02/2012 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Third Judicial District Sweetwater County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20) | ||
Short Title: | RAYMOND ALEXANDER VERHEYDT v. TAMMI WAI-PING VERHEYDT | ||||
Full Title: | RAYMOND ALEXANDER VERHEYDT, Appellant (Defendant), v. TAMMI WAI-PING VERHEYDT, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Raymond Alexander Verheydt | Galen Bruce Woelk |
Appellee | Tammi Wai-Ping Verheydt | Elizabeth Greenwood Inga L. Parsons |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Child Support, Marriage and Divorce |
Opinion Number: | 2013 WY 25 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
07/02/2012 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
07/02/2012 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
07/02/2012 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
07/02/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
08/02/2012 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
08/06/2012 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief and Designation of Record on Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/13/2012 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
09/17/2012 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Response Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/20/2012 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
09/21/2012 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/21/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
09/26/2012 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
10/03/2012 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
10/03/2012 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes (Volume I, pleadings; Volume II, confidential folder; Volume III, original unredacted pleadings) | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
10/03/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
10/08/2012 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
03/05/2013 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
03/20/2013 | Motion - Fees and costs | Motion | Fees and costs | Final | |
03/20/2013 | Affidavit - Attorney fees and costs | Affidavit | Attorney fees and costs | Final | |
03/28/2013 | Response/Objection - Costs | Response/Objection | Costs | Final | |
03/29/2013 | Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellee requesting hardcopies of Motion and Affidavit. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
03/29/2013 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Response and Objection To Appellee's Motion for Attorneys' Fees & Costs; and received proposed order. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/02/2013 | Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellee. She was out of town last week. Will be mailing original and six copies of motion and affidavit today. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
04/05/2013 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Motion for Attorneys' Fees & Costs; and Affidavit in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/09/2013 | Order - Denying Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs | Order | Deny | Final | |
04/09/2013 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
04/09/2013 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
04/09/2013 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
04/09/2013 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
04/15/2013 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/10/2013. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |