Case: 02-98-00441-CR
02-98-00441-CR
09/23/1998
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Wood, Randy Lee
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/01/2004 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
05/06/2004 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
07/06/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/07/2000 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | Refused | |
12/29/1999 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | | |
12/28/1999 | Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/24/1999 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
11/01/1999 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
10/14/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/14/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
07/08/1999 | Letter Brief Filed | | |
07/02/1999 | Letter Brief Filed | | |
06/29/1999 | Submitted | | |
06/29/1999 | Submission | | |
06/22/1999 | Submission | | |
03/18/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
03/18/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/18/1999 | Submission | | |
02/19/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
01/20/1999 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/19/1999 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
12/28/1998 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/18/1998 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
11/18/1998 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
11/18/1998 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
09/23/1998 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | | |
09/23/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/06/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Matthew W. Paul |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Tim Cole |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Tim Cole |
Wood, Randy Lee | Criminal - Appellant | James A. Rasmussen |
Trial Court Information
97th District Court
Montague
Honorable Roger E. Towery
97-01-0004M-CR
Life IDTDCJ