Case Information: 35068 | |||
Short Caption: | COMMISSION ON ETHICS VS. GATES | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A393960 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 11/04/1999 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/03/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
11/03/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-10791 | |
11/03/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
11/04/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
11/18/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: November 3, 1999. | 99-11448 | |
02/24/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: The parties have worked out a tentative settlement subject to approval of the Commission on Ethics. If settlement not approved a settlement conference will be scheduled thereafter. | 00-02924 | |
04/20/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 17, 2000. | 00-06334 | |
05/31/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 00-09141 | |
05/31/2000 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 00-09142 | |
06/14/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NNP/CLK | 00-10136 | |
06/14/2000 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |