judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NAHIMANA MBONA V. CAROLYN CHAMBERS

Case Information: 11-FM-0782
Short Caption:NAHIMANA MBONA V. CAROLYN CHAMBERSClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO1586-11Filed Date:06/21/2011

Opening Event Date:06/21/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/30/2012
Argued/Submitted:09/05/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/28/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNahimana Mbona NPro SeN
AppelleeCarolyn Chambers N
Megan Sarah BeldenYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/21/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/12/2011FiledOn consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on June 21, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (dlm)
07/26/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
08/15/2011FiledRecord Index
09/09/2011FiledOrder direcing status of transcripts
09/13/2011FiledAppearance Atty Calvo for (Appellee)
09/21/2011FiledStatement regarding status of the transcripts. (No transcript needed) (Appellant)
10/03/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/02/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File - Appendix, Brief (Appellant) 12/30/2011
12/30/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/30/2011FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
01/30/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/30/2012FiledBriefing Completed
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Other
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/05/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Newman, Nebeker, Schwelb
09/06/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Newman, Nebeker and Schwelb, Senior Judges.)
09/28/2012FiledMandate