judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

OWENSBY, LEON M. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-1108
Short Caption:OWENSBY, LEON M. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead:81-CF-1108Consolidated: 83-CF-0613
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F51260-76Filed Date:08/07/1981

Opening Event Date:08/07/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/24/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/02/1984
Argued/Submitted:10/10/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Kenneth E. Labowitz YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Wendy Bebie YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901OWENSBY, LEON M. UNITED STATES
08/07/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/24/1981FiledRecord Completed
07/02/1984FiledBriefing Completed
10/10/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/01/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition