judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6654
A-6654
01/14/1958
Application for Writ of Error
FRENCH DRILLING AND WELL SERVICE, INC.
WILSON MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/26/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/11/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
01/28/1958Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
01/23/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
01/14/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/26/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/11/1958Response to Petition
01/28/1958Supplement to Petition filed
01/23/1958Response to Petition
01/14/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/14/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wilson Manufacturing CompanyRespondent
French Drilling and Well Service, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information