Case Information: 81-CF-1097 | |||
Short Caption: | SISTRUNK, JOHNNY C. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F5442-80 | Filed Date: | 08/10/1981 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/10/1981 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 05/24/1982 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 11/08/1982 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | SISTRUNK, JOHNNY C. UNITED STATES | |||
08/10/1981 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
05/24/1982 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
11/08/1982 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
03/08/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |