judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RONALD MUELLER, as an individual and Director of the Star Valley Ranch Association; and WILLIAM L. DALEY, an individual v. VINCE ZIMMER, an individual; and STEVE CRITTENDEN, an individual

Case Heading (S-07-0043)
Case Number:S-07-0043Case Docketed On:02/26/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Corporations, Partnerships and Associations (Title 17)
Short Title:RONALD MUELLER, as an individual and Director of the Star Valley Ranch Association; and WILLIAM L. DALEY, an individual v. VINCE ZIMMER, an individual; and STEVE CRITTENDEN, an individual
Full Title:RONALD MUELLER, as an individual and Director of the Star Valley Ranch Association; and WILLIAM L. DALEY, an individual, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. VINCE ZIMMER, an individual; and STEVE CRITTENDEN, an individual, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonald MuellerRobert John Logan
AppellantWilliam L. DaleyRobert John Logan
AppelleeVince ZimmerJohn R. Hursh
AppelleeSteve CrittendenJohn R. Hursh

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 195
Citation:173 P.3d 361

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/26/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/26/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/12/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/19/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
04/25/2007Motion - Strike appendix No. 3 attached to appellees' briefMotionStrikeFinal
04/25/2007Memorandum - In support of motionMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
04/26/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/07/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/08/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/14/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, eleven total volumes. Volumes II, III, IV & VII, original papers; Volume X, depositions; Volume XI, transcript; Volumes XII, XIII, XIV & XV, original papers; Volume XVI, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/23/2007Order - Striking appendix No. 3 attached to appellees briefOrderStrikingFinal
12/11/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/28/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/28/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/02/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal