judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BENNETT VS. BKS IYENGARA

Case Information: 33671
Short Caption:BENNETT VS. BKS IYENGARACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A363613Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/05/1999 / Ecker, HowardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/27/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
01/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00564
01/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
02/04/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Jolley Urga Wirth & Woodbury--check no. 509545.
02/04/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Appellants. 99-00802
02/05/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Howard Ecker. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/01/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-01375
03/01/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-01376
03/12/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs." NRAP 42(b). The pending motion to withdraw as appellants' counsel is moot. SNP/CLK 99-01775
03/12/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.