Case Information: 11-CV-0806 | |||
Short Caption: | DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS V. DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS, F.O.P. | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Lead: | 11-CV-0610 | Consolidated: | 11-CV-0806 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CAC1505-10 | Filed Date: | 06/30/2011 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/30/2011 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 08/31/2011 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 03/16/2012 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 06/12/2012 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 07/17/2012 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | D.C. Department of Corrections | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | Department of Correction Faternal of Police | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
06/30/2011 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
07/22/2011 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Consolidate and F/O Appeals Coordinator to transmit record index for 10-CV-806 and F/O 6/13/11 Briefing Order Amended to Reflect BA & Appdx due within 40 days | ||
08/19/2011 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | ||
08/31/2011 | Filed | Opposition to aplt's motion for extension of time. (Appellee) | ||
08/31/2011 | Filed | Record Copies 11cv806 | ||
08/31/2011 | Filed | Record Index 11cv806 | ||
08/31/2011 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
09/08/2011 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to 9/30/11. | ||
09/23/2011 | Filed | Motion For Summary Reversal (Appellant) | ||
09/26/2011 | Filed | TMC/MOTION FOR REVERSAL//OPPO//REPLY//PETITION FOR EN BANC HEARING ON MOTION FOR REVERSAL | ||
10/05/2011 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File to aplt's motion for summary reversal and aplt's reply pleading Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellee) | Granted | |
10/07/2011 | Filed | Order Granting MOET and APPELLEE'S RESPONSE TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 10/25/11... | ||
10/25/2011 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File - opposition to aplt's motion for summary reversal (Appellee) | ||
11/01/2011 | Lodged | Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Summary Reversal. (Appellee) | ||
11/02/2011 | Filed | Petition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellee) | ||
11/04/2011 | Filed | Reply to opposition to motion for summary reversal (Appellant) | ||
12/20/2011 | Filed | Order Denying appellant's motion for summary judgment. Appellant's brief shall be filed within 40 day of the date of the order, appellee's brief 30 days thereafter. (FIBRTE) | ||
12/20/2011 | Filed | Order Denying appellee's petition for hearing en banc is denied without prejudice to appellee filing a petition for intial hearing en banc at the appropriate time. (FIBRTE) | ||
01/20/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to February 13, 2012. Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
01/25/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to February 13, 2012. Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | ||
02/03/2012 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
02/03/2012 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) | ||
03/02/2012 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | Granted | |
03/08/2012 | Filed | Motion of District of Columbia Department of Correction to file corrected brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
03/16/2012 | Filed | Order Granting Motion of District of Columbia Department of Correction to file corrected brief (Appellant) | ||
03/16/2012 | Filed | Amended/Corrected Brief (Appellant) | ||
03/16/2012 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | ||
03/16/2012 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | ||
03/16/2012 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
04/04/2012 | Filed | Reply Brief (Appellant) | ||
04/12/2012 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular | ||
04/12/2012 | Filed | Letter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring | ||
04/20/2012 | Filed | Letter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant) | ||
05/01/2012 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
06/12/2012 | Filed | Argued Before Judge Thompson,Easterly,Nebeker. James C. McKay Esq.,for appellant, J. Michael Hannon Esq.,for appellee. | ||
06/25/2012 | Filed | Reversed (OPINION) (Thompson and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.) | ||
07/17/2012 | Filed | Mandate |