Case Information: 32387 | |||
Short Caption: | DOLBOW (FRANK) VS. DISTRICT COURT C/W 32233/32388 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 32233 *, 32387, 32388 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9705918 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 02/14/2000 at 11:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 02/14/2000 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/21/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. In forma pauperis. | ||
05/21/1998 | Writ | Filed Writ. Filed Original Petition for Writ of Prohibition. | ||
05/21/1998 | Other | Other. Notice of Procedural Deficiency: Proof of service on the respondent district judge and proof of service on all parties to the action in the trial court. | ||
05/28/1998 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. | ||
06/01/1998 | Other | Other. Filed Certificate of Service (Rosa Diaz). | ||
05/24/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. | ||
06/07/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Filed Notice to the Court. Assistant U.S. Attorney Ronald C. Rachow states that he is not counsel for real party in interest. Nos. 32387, 32388. | ||
06/15/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion. Filed Motion for Leave to file Brief of Amicus Curiae. | ||
06/15/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Filed Order Consolidating Petitions. As these petitions raise identical issues we consolidate them for purposes of review. Real parties in interest Rosa Diaz (Docket No. 32387) and Charneath Bradford (Docket No. 32388) shall have 15 days from the date of this order to address, any issues not previously addressed in the answer to the petition in Docket No. 32233. Nos. 32233, 32387, 32388. | ||
06/22/1999 | Other | Other. Filed Opposition to the request by the Washoe County District Attorney to file a brief of amicus curaie. (nos. 32233, 32387, 32388). | ||
10/05/1999 | Other | Other. Filed Order the Washoe County District Attorney initiated the contempt proceeding in docket No. 32233, and is acting a a special prosecutor to assist the respondent district court. This order resolves certainmotions pending before this court, and clarifies the status of parties to these petitions. We direct the clerk to remove the real parties in interest from the captions on ths court's docket with respect to these consolidated petitions. In light of District Judge Scott Jordan's appointment order of June 1, 1999we direct the clerk of this court to amend the docket sheets to reflect the Washoe County District Attorney as counsel for respondents in docket Nos. 32387 and 32388. We deny the Washoe County District Attorney's motions for leave to file briefs as amicus curiae. Fn3[We have detemined that the Washoe County District Attorney cannot concomitantly appear as both counsel for respondents and amicus curiae]. We direct the clerk of this court to file the Washoe County District Attorney's proposed amicus curiae briefs in Docket No. 32387 and 32388, and denominate such briefs as answers to the petitions. Fn4[In the future, the Washoe County District Attorney should refrain from attaching to its motion documents which the motion seeks leave to file. Such documents may be submitted provisionally with, but separately from , the motion]. (Docket sheets and case cards corrected by removing the real parties in interest from the captions). Nos. 32233, 32387, 32388. | ||
10/05/1999 | Other | Other. Filed Answer in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Prohibition. | ||
12/23/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for February 14, 2000, at the hour of 11:30 a.m. - 1/2 hr. in Carson City (NNP99B - CY/DA/ML) Nos. 32233/32387/32388. | ||
01/31/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (32233, 32387, 32388) | 00-01494 | |
02/14/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Oral argument before the Northern Nevada Panel: submitted. Nos. 32233, 32387, 32388. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | ||
05/24/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. These are consolidated petitions for writs of prohibition. " . . . we deny these petitions." Nos. 32233, 32387, 32388. Document No. 00-08713. | ||
05/26/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Supplement Memoranda in Support of Writ of Prohibition (nos. 32233/32387/32388). | ||
06/12/2000 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 32233, 32387, 32388. (Hand delivered: Reno Carson Messenger) | ||
09/07/2000 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[We grant petitioners' May 26, 2000, motion to file supplemental memoranda in support of the writ of prohibition. The clerk of this court shall detach and file the document received from petitioners on May 26, 2000. Nos. 32233, 32387, 32388. Document No. 00-14768. | ||
09/07/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Supplemental memoranda in support of the writ of prohibition. 09/07/00 order: detached from the motion filed on May 26, 2000 and filed this supplemental memoranda. Nos. 32233, 32387, 32388. Document No. 00-15770. | ||
09/25/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 00-15867 | |
09/25/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |