Case: 05-98-01447-CR
05-98-01447-CR
09/02/1998
Assault or Attempted Murder
Sanders, Jr., Donald Ray
The State of Texas
No
2nd Court of Appeals
10/16/1998
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/12/1998 | Record due | | |
10/16/1998 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/16/1998 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/15/1998 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
09/03/1998 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
09/02/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
09/02/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
08/17/1998 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
08/17/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
08/14/1998 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/16/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | John Roach, Sr. |
Donald Ray Sanders, Jr. | Criminal - Appellant | Roger V. Dickey |
Sheri Vecera | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Collin Court Reporter, 199th District Court |
Trial Court Information
199th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Robert Dry
199-81041-97
18 Years/$18000 fine