Case Heading (S-12-0173) | |||||
Case Number: | S-12-0173 | Case Docketed On: | 07/26/2012 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Second Judicial District Albany County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901 | ||
Short Title: | KIET HOANG NGUYEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | KIET HOANG NGUYEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Kiet Hoang Nguyen | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson Kirk Allan Morgan |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Gregory A. Phillips David L. Delicath Theodore R. Racines Jeffrey Scott Pope |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Guilty plea |
Opinion Number: | 2013 WY 50 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
07/26/2012 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
07/26/2012 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court. Judgment, Sentence and Order of Incarceration signed by Judge's Law Clerk | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
07/26/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
08/06/2012 | Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion | Record | Court Reporter's certificate of completion | Final | |
09/12/2012 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
09/12/2012 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/30/2012 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
10/30/2012 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/05/2012 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
11/20/2012 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
11/20/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
11/26/2012 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
11/26/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
04/30/2013 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
05/03/2013 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - warden's copy of opinion signed for 5/2/2013 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final | |
05/16/2013 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
05/16/2013 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
05/16/2013 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
05/21/2013 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for 5/20/2013 by agent for warden at WSP. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final | |
05/21/2013 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/20/2013. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |