judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RUNION (TRAVIS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32441
Short Caption:RUNION (TRAVIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C140453Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/14/2000 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:03/14/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/01/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
06/01/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
06/08/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified Copy of Transcript of Proceedings. Calendar Call-7/30/97. Court Reporter: Robert Mintun.
06/22/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified Copy of Transcript of Proceedings. 1/22/97. Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith.
07/09/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
09/03/1998MotionFiled Motion. Extension of Time (Court Reporter).
09/22/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Court reporter James A. Helleso has filed a motion for an extension of time to prepare the transcript requested in this matter. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form and serve a copy of the transcript request form on the court reporter and all parties to this appeal. Court reporter Helleso shall have 30 days from the filing of the transcript request form to complete the transcript. Appellant shall have 45 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. We do not expect further delays in this matter absent extreme and unforseeable circumstances.
09/25/1998MotionFiled Stipulation. Stricken by Order 10/19/98.
10/02/1998MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order Issued by Supreme Court and Motion to Withdraw Stipulation to Enlarge Time in Which to File Opening Brief.
10/02/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings.
10/05/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified Copy of Transcript of Proceedings. 8/11/97; 1/26/98; 1/29/98; 2/2/98; 2/3/98; 2/4/98; 2/5/98; 2/24/98; 3/13/98; 3/31/98; 4/1/98; 4/30/98. Court Reporter: James A. Helleso.
10/19/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We grant appellant's motion for leave to withdraw the stipulation for an extension of time to file the opening brief. The clerk shall forthwith strike the stipulation filed by the parties on October 2, 1998. (Stipulation filed 9/25/98: STRICKEN.)
11/16/1998MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Appellant may have to and including December 16, 1998, within to file the opening brief.
03/08/1999MotionFiled Motion. Application for extension of time.
03/08/1999MotionFiled Motion. Leave to File Thirty-Eight Page Appellant's Opening Brief.
03/08/1999BriefReceived Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark.)
03/08/1999AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
03/12/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant's March 8, 1999, motions are granted. The clerk of this court shall forthwith file appellant's thirty-eight page opening brief and appellant's appendix, provisionally submitted with the motions, respondent shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, to file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
03/12/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief.
03/12/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
03/17/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Transcript of Proceedings for 01/15/98 and 01/16/98. Court Reporter: James A. Helleso.
04/13/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondent shall have to and including April 26, 1999, to file and serve the Answering Brief.
04/27/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark.)
05/26/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant may have to and including June 28, 1999, within which to file the reply brief.
06/25/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark.)
01/21/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for March 14, 2000, at the hour of 9:00 a.m. - 1/2 hr. in Las Vegas (SNP99B-WM/MS/NB).
02/29/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-03155
03/14/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel: submitted. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
12/04/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. FN5[Because this matter is remanded to the district court for a new trial, Runion's remaining assignment of error concerning the district court's denial of his motion for a new trial based on new evidence regarding witness Spomer's credibility is moot. Should Spomer testify at retrial, Runion will have the opportunity to raise these concerns during cross-examination.] Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 111. En Banc-RR/CY/WM/MS/DA/ML/NB 00-21057
01/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21242
01/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 9, 2001. 00-21242