judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRUCE B. WILLIAMS v. CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0070)
Case Number:S-10-0070Case Docketed On:04/02/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - United States Constitution
Short Title:BRUCE B. WILLIAMS v. CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING
Full Title:BRUCE B. WILLIAMS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBruce B. Williams Pro Se
AppelleeCity of Gillette, WyomingCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Jurisdiction
Opinion Number:2011 WY 4
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/02/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/02/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Statement of EvidenceNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
05/17/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/29/2010Brief - Appellee and Statement of CostsBriefAppelleeFinal
06/29/2010Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
06/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee and statement of costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - City of Gillette, Wyoming's brief of appellee errataEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/30/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/19/2010Brief - Appellant reply; and received copy of designation of record. (Mr. Williams was told that designation of record was to be filed in the District Court)BriefAppellant replyFinal
07/20/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/28/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/31/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
01/19/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/04/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/04/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/08/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/7/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal