judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LANKOWSKI VS. FRIES

Case Information: 38430
Short Caption:LANKOWSKI VS. FRIESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A384608Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/14/2001 / Robinson, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/04/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Palazzo Law Firm--check no. 3228.
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14919
09/12/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Decision & Order filed 7/26/01; Notice of Entry filed 7/30/01. Due Date: 10 days
09/14/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David K. Robinson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/19/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Decision and Order filed in district court on: July 26, 2001. 01-15858
09/19/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: July 30, 2001. 01-15859
09/21/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. David K. Robinson.
09/26/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-16207
10/10/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 01-17027
10/10/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.