judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHERIDAN COUNTY COMMISSION, SHERIDAN COUNTY, WYOMING v. V.O. GOLD PROPERTIES, LLC

Case Heading (S-10-0071)
Case Number:S-10-0071Case Docketed On:04/02/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:SHERIDAN COUNTY COMMISSION, SHERIDAN COUNTY, WYOMING v. V.O. GOLD PROPERTIES, LLC
Full Title:SHERIDAN COUNTY COMMISSION, SHERIDAN COUNTY, WYOMING, Appellant (Respondent), v. V.O. GOLD PROPERTIES, LLC, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThe Board of County Commissioners of Sheridan County, WyomingMatthew F. Redle
Lynn Marie Smith
AppelleeV. O. Gold Properties, LLCEric Keimond Nelson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure
Opinion Number:2011 WY 16
Citation:247 P.3d 48

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/02/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/02/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/19/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant (Statement of Costs Attached) and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/06/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/22/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/29/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-IV, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/10/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Nelson for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Matthew F. Redle for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/23/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Matthew F. Redle, County Attorney for appellant; Eric K. Nelson for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/23/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/04/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirmed in part and reversed in part, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/23/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/23/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/28/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/25/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal