judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: REINSTATEMENT OF GORDON E. LOGAN

Case Information: 38450
Short Caption:IN RE: REINSTATEMENT OF GORDON E. LOGANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Reinstatement - Petition
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/11/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. 1 and 2. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-15271
04/02/2002OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti.
04/03/2002Order/Dispositional BarFiled Bar Discipline Order. "Logan is reinstated to the practice of law, subject to the conditions recommended by the panel." fn2[The Honorable Deborah Agosti, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC 02-05900
04/30/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2 this day. 02-07616
04/30/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/06/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Certificate of Service by Mail and Notice of Order to Public. 02-07874
05/10/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by State Bar of Nevada on May 1, 2002. 02-07616