judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GERMINIA ORTENCIA SOLIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0092)
Case Number:S-10-0092Case Docketed On:04/26/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:GERMINIA ORTENCIA SOLIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:GERMINIA ORTENCIA SOLIS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGerminia Ortencia SolisDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Meggan Hathaway
Jessica Y. Frint

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Restitution and Other Assessments
Opinion Number:2010 WY 165
Citation:245 P.3d 323

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/26/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/26/2010Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
04/28/2010Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
06/10/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/26/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
07/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Designation of Record and Consent and Approval for Meggan Hathaway and Jessica Y. FrintEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/03/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/17/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/20/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/05/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
12/16/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order - reversing restitution order, Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/04/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/04/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/07/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/6/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal