judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ANN COOPER PENNING; ELIZABETH HUGHES,ETAL,APLTS

Case Information: 11-PR-0449
Short Caption:IN RE: ANN COOPER PENNING; ELIZABETH HUGHES,ETAL,APLTSClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:INT324-02Filed Date:03/30/2011

Opening Event Date:03/30/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/27/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantElizabeth Hughes NPro SeN
AppellantGeorge J. Hughes NPro SeN
AppellantHughes & Bentzen PlLCN
Elizabeth HughesNY
George J. Hughes NN
AppelleeUgo Gramegna NPro SeN
AppelleeAnn Cooper Penning N
George A. TeitelbaumNN
AppelleeJohn H. Cooper N
Mark E. SchamelNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/30/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/11/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (*ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF APPEAL) (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED for 8/25/08, 6/20/08, 11/20/07, 11/5/07, 10/26/07, 9/10/07, 8/29/07, 1/19/05, 2/24/04, 1/28/04, 7/16/03, 5/22/03, & 1/16/03) (elp)
04/20/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 30, 2011, and the statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and transcripts in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
05/18/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 1/16/03, 5/22/03, 7/16/03, 1/28/04, 2/24/04, 1/19/05, 9/10/07, 10/15/07, 10/26/07, 11/5/07, 11/20/07, 6/20/08 & 8/25/08) (elp)
05/26/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND
06/14/2011 On consideration of appellants' motion to remand this case to the Superior Court, and it appearing that the trial court is inclined to grant appellants' pending Super. Civ. Ct. R. 60 motion, it is ORDERED that appellants' motion is granted and this appeal is hereby dismissed and the case is remanded to the trial court for further proceedings consistent with statements made in appellants' motion. See Smith v. Pollin 90 U.S. App. D.C. 178, 194 F. 2d 349 (1952). Appellants are to pay any costs or fees related to this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. (ETW) elp
06/14/2011DISMISSED
06/27/2011MANDATE ISSUED
08/05/2011FiledReceived ORDER dated 4/20/11, mailed to (Appellee Gramegna) and returned by the United States Postal Office as "undeliverable."