judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD BURROWS V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 11-AA-0430
Short Caption:RONALD BURROWS V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB197-10Filed Date:04/08/2011

Opening Event Date:04/08/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/12/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/30/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/16/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/21/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentM.C. DEAN, INC.N
Mark W. BertramYN
Intervenor-RespondentZurich American InsuranceN
Mark W. BertramYN
PetitionerRonald Burrows N
Matthew J. PefferNY
Benjamin T. BoscoloYY
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY
Andrew Van Brisker NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/08/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
04/08/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
04/11/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. & Gregory Lamb, Esq.
04/22/2011PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to correct the Petition for Review.
05/12/2011FiledRECORD ON APPEAL w/hearing of 2/12/08
05/12/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/27/2011FiledORDER GRANT PTNR MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to correct the error in the petition for review
05/27/2011FiledIt appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (dlm)
05/27/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to correct the error in the petition for review. It is (MORE)
05/27/2011 ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (ETW)
07/13/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to August 12, 2011 (no oppo). (Petitioner)
07/18/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)
07/26/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) on or before 8/12/11.
07/26/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File a Motion to intervene M.C. Dean Inc on behalf of RespGranted
08/09/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to intervene (M.C. Dean Inc and Zurich American Insurance Co.) and intervenors' brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date petitioner's brief is filed with this court.
08/12/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
08/12/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
09/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
09/12/2011FiledBrief (Intervenor-Respondent M.C. DEAN, INC., Intervenor-Respondent Zurich American Insurance)
09/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) 10/7/11
09/30/2011FiledMemorandum/Statement In Lieu Of Brief (Respondent)
09/30/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/30/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Motion for Oral Argument Out of Time to January 6, 2012. Other (Petitioner)
01/17/2012FiledOrder Denying petitioner's motion for oral argument.
01/17/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Petitioner)
02/16/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Oberly, Reid
07/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge)
08/21/2012FiledMandate