Case Information: 79950 | |||
Short Caption: | SATICOY BAY LLC SER. 244 VERTIGO TULIP VS. THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A751660 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | Exempt | |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/06/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | ||
11/06/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | 19-45609 | |
11/06/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | 19-45614 | |
11/12/2019 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Michael F. Bohn | ||
11/12/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | 19-46247 | |
11/13/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC). | 19-46508 | |
11/26/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/17/19. To Court Reporter: Jessica Kirkpatrick. (SC) | 19-48330 | |
12/03/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (SC) | 19-49048 | |
12/20/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Kaihla Berndt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/17/19. (SC) | 19-51637 | |
01/17/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | 20-02438 | |
01/27/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, "this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. | 20-03705 |