judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RUNGE VS. RUNGE

Case Information: 38432
Short Caption:RUNGE VS. RUNGECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D248960Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/04/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bruce I. Shapiro, Ltd.--check no. 1653.
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. -SEALED- Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14928
09/17/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15709
09/24/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 19, 2001. To Court Reporter: Deborah Casper. 01-16096
01/31/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 01/28/02. Signed by: Bruce I. Shapiro. 02-02080
01/31/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-02081
02/04/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Amended Docketing Statement and for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. 02-02264
03/08/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 02-04250
03/20/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). Appellant's February 4, 2002, motion to file an amended docketing statement and for an extension of time to file and serve the opening brief and appendix is denied as moot. The amended docketing statement received on February 4, 2002, shall be returned to appellant, unfiled. NNP/CLK 02-04959
03/20/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Bruce I. Shapiro. Returned unfiled, the original and one copy of the Amended Docketing Statement received February 4, 2002. 02-04960
03/20/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.