judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARYANNE TAGOE V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVS.

Case Information: 11-AA-0429
Short Caption:MARYANNE TAGOE V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:AHD287-03FFiled Date:04/06/2011

Opening Event Date:04/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/18/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
IntervenorHoward University HospitalN
William H. SchladtNY
IntervenorSedgwick Claims ManagementN
William H. SchladtNY
PetitionerMaryanne Tagoe YPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/06/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
04/06/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
04/19/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to April. It is F/ORDERED that the Administrative Agency shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. (ETW)
04/19/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO KIM & FITZPATRICK
06/20/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcripts
06/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/22/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE Howard University Hospital
06/22/2011RECEIVED- intervenor's motion to dismiss appeal
06/24/2011PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION - to intervenor's motion to dismiss & motion to intervene
06/30/2011PTNR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD and Strike Documents from Record.
07/01/2011RECEIVED - intervenor's reply to oppo to motion to dismiss and motion to intervene.
07/05/2011PETITIONER'S REPLY to respondent's reply to oppo to respondent't motion to dismiss and motion to intervene (dwm)
07/12/2011FiledTMC - motion for leave to intervene (-) - intervenor's motion to dismiss (-); petitioner's motion to supp record; oppo - reply
07/26/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION TO INTERVENE and FILE THE MOTION TO DISMISS
07/26/2011FiledMOTION TO DISMISS (Intervenor Howard University Hospital, Intervenor Sedgwick Claims Management)
07/26/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION TO DISMISS and DENYING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD and TO STRIKE DOCUMENTS AS MOOT.
07/26/2011FiledDismissed
08/18/2011FiledMandate