Case Information: 11-AA-0463 | |||
Short Caption: | WASHINGTON GAS LIGHT CO. V. D.C. DEP'T OF TRANSPORTATION | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Dept of Transportation |
Lead: | 11-AA-0253 | Consolidated: | 11-AA-0463 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DTVM101908-08 | Filed Date: | 04/18/2011 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/18/2011 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/04/2012 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Petitioner | Washington Gas Light Company | N |
| |||||||||
Respondent | District of Columbia Department of Transportation | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
04/18/2011 | PETITION FOR REVIEW | |||
04/18/2011 | FILING FEE of $100.00. | |||
04/18/2011 | CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq. | |||
04/27/2011 | ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 20 DAYS frOm the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be taken soley from the March 17, 2011 denial of the motion for relief from the Final Order... (BY: ETW) | |||
05/11/2011 | RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - to order dated 4/27/11 | |||
05/18/2011 | On further consideration of this court's 4/27/11 order...the response thereto, wherein petitioner states that its' intent is to APPEAL ONLY THE MARCH 17, 2011 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the OTSC IS HEREBY DISCHARGED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that OAH SHALL FILE THE RECORD W/N 60 DAYS... (BY: ETW) LW | |||
01/30/2012 | Filed | Motion to Hold Proceedings and Briefing in Abeyance so that Parties can Discuss Settlement. (Respondent) | Granted | |
02/09/2012 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Stay Appeal | ||
03/02/2012 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals - 11-AA-253 & 11-AA-463 | ||
03/07/2012 | Filed | Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Respondent) | ||
03/07/2012 | Filed | Motion To Dismiss Appeal 11-AA-253 (Respondent) | Granted | |
03/13/2012 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Dismiss (Respondent) | ||
03/13/2012 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
04/04/2012 | Filed | Mandate |