judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALLEN EUGENE AKIN, JR., a Wyoming citizen, and SARAH SCHOENFELD, a Washington citizen v. MOUNTAIN WEST FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wyoming Insurance Company

Case Heading (S-10-0108)
Case Number:S-10-0108Case Docketed On:05/12/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26)
Short Title:ALLEN EUGENE AKIN, JR., a Wyoming citizen, and SARAH SCHOENFELD, a Washington citizen v. MOUNTAIN WEST FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wyoming Insurance Company
Full Title:ALLEN EUGENE AKIN, JR., a Wyoming citizen, and SARAH SCHOENFELD, a Washington citizen, Appellants (Defendants), v. MOUNTAIN WEST FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wyoming Insurance Company, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAllen Eugene Akin Jr.Tracy J. Copenhaver
AppellantSarah SchoenfeldStephen L. Simonton
AppelleeMountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance CompanyGeorge E. Powers Jr.

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/12/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/12/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/28/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/29/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time - BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/30/2010Order - Grant - extension of time (Nunc pro tunc)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/16/2010Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
08/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulation to dismiss appeal with prejudice; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/16/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
08/16/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal