judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KAMBIZ SOLTANI V. D.C. DEP'T OF THE ENVIRONMENT

Case Information: 11-AA-0474
Short Caption:KAMBIZ SOLTANI V. D.C. DEP'T OF THE ENVIRONMENTClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DEIK200296Filed Date:04/20/2011

Opening Event Date:04/20/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/31/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerKambiz Soltani NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Energy & EnvironmentN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/20/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
04/20/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
04/21/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
05/05/2011 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
07/06/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY
07/13/2011FiledTMC-MOTION TO STAY FINE
07/21/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
07/21/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/25/2011FiledOrder Denying MOTION TO STAY
07/28/2011FiledBriefing Order
07/28/2011FiledMotion To Remand (Respondent)Granted
08/08/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Remand (Respondent)
08/08/2011FiledRemanded
08/31/2011FiledMandate