Case Heading (S-11-0260) | |||||
Case Number: | S-11-0260 | Case Docketed On: | 11/14/2011 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Ninth Judicial District Teton County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1) | ||
Short Title: | WILLIAM R. FIX v. SOUTH WILDERNESS RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, a Wyoming unincorporated non-profit association and FRANK FORELLE | ||||
Full Title: | WILLIAM R. FIX, Appellant (Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff and Third-Party Plaintiff), v. SOUTH WILDERNESS RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, a Wyoming unincorporated non-profit association, Appellee (Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant), and FRANK FORELLE, Appellee (Third-Party Defendant/Counter-Defendant). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | William R. Fix | Pro Se |
Appellee | South Wilderness Ranch Homeowners Association | Matthew E. Turner |
Appellee | Frank Forelle | Edward Frank Hess |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Attorney Fees, Civil Procedure, Property -Servitudes |
Opinion Number: | 2012 WY 96 |
Citation: | 280 P.3d 527 (Wyo. 2012) |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
11/14/2011 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
11/14/2011 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court (Notice received 11/07/11, docket fee check missing) | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
11/14/2011 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
11/14/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
01/03/2012 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
01/04/2012 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Opening Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
01/30/2012 | Notice-Incoming - Amended index | Notice-Incoming | Amended index | Final | |
02/13/2012 | Brief - Appellee South Wilderness Ranch Homeowners Association | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
02/14/2012 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee South Wilderness Ranch Homeowners Association's Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/22/2012 | Brief - Failure to file - appellee (Frank Forelle) | Brief | Failure to file - appellee | Final | |
03/02/2012 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
03/02/2012 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
03/05/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
03/05/2012 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/12/2012 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
03/12/2012 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; Volume IV, attachments, exhibits and transcripts. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
03/12/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
03/14/2012 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
05/16/2012 | Motion - Supplement the record | Motion | Supplement the record | Final | |
05/21/2012 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to Supplement Record on Appeal Pursuant to W.R.A.P. 3.04 | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/05/2012 | Order - Granting Motion to Supplement Record on Appeal | Order | Grant | Final | |
06/11/2012 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court (supplemental record) | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
06/11/2012 | Record - Supplemental record on appeal from district court clerk - Order Pursuant to Rule 56(d) - Labeled as Volume V. | Record | Supplemental record on appeal | Final | |
06/11/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Supplemental record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Supplemental record on appeal filed | Final | |
07/12/2012 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, but vacating legal research costs. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
07/30/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
07/30/2012 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
07/30/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
07/30/2012 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
08/06/2012 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/2/2012. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |