judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ACRI VS. DETROLIO

Case Information: 33599
Short Caption:ACRI VS. DETROLIOCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34792 , 35932
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A385377Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mitchell Acri--check no. 3284.
01/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00212
04/13/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-02812
05/11/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-03807
05/11/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/04/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 27, 1999. 99-03807