judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DERRICK TAVON CARTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0465
Short Caption:DERRICK TAVON CARTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-18792-10Filed Date:04/13/2011

Opening Event Date:04/13/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/13/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDerrick T. Carter Y
Joanne M. VascoYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Uma M. AmuluruNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/13/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/29/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Joanne Vasco, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/29/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Joanne Vasco, ESQUIRE
05/10/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
06/29/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CF-465 and 11-CF-748 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Aric Mason in appeal no. 11-CF-748. F/O that counsel for appellant Aric Mason shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date fo this order complete and file withthis court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion inthe record on appeal. (JAC)
07/01/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (MASON) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (25 pgs/tape) 1/24/11 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (172 pgs/Davis) 1/24/11 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (8 pgs/tape) 1/25/11 proc
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (200 pgs/McCarn) 1/25/11 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (177 pgs/Rogers) 1/26/11 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (97 PGS/McCarn) 1/28/11 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (217 pgs/Rogers) 1/31/11 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (102 pgs/McCarn) 2/1/11 proc.
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (9 pgs/Rogers) 2/2/11 proc. w/cd
08/02/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-465)
08/02/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CF-465)
09/21/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-748)
09/21/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CF-748)
09/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (31 pgs/Wood) 4/6/11 proc.
09/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (19 pgs/Hunt) 5/13/11 proc. w/cd
09/22/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/30/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/03/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Mason) (Appellant)Granted
11/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - for 90 days (Carter) (Appellant)Granted
11/16/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellants' motions for extension and appellant Mason's brief and limited appendox due 2/7/12, and brief and limited appendix of appellant Carter due 2/7/12.
02/01/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Mason) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/06/2012FiledBrief (Appellant) (Carter)
02/06/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant) (attached to brief)
02/29/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant Aric Mason's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 5/7/12.
05/01/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Mason) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
05/15/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief for 45 days (Appellant) to 8/6/12
08/17/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant) and appeal no. 11-CF-748 is hereby dismissed. Brief of appellee in appeal no. 11-cf-465 due w/n 30 days.
09/17/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
09/19/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
01/22/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
01/22/2013FiledAffirmed
02/13/2013FiledMandate