judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REX ADAMS v. BETTY WALTON, M.D.

Case Heading (S-10-0109)
Case Number:S-10-0109Case Docketed On:05/14/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:REX ADAMS v. BETTY WALTON, M.D.
Full Title:REX ADAMS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BETTY WALTON, M.D., Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRex AdamsV. Anthony Vehar
AppelleeBetty Walton M.D.Stephenson Dow Emery

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Limitation of Actions
Opinion Number:2011 WY 58
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/14/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/14/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/21/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/09/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and copy of Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/13/2010Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
08/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for pro hac vice admission of Clark NewhallEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/18/2010Order - Pro hac vice - allowing admission of Clark Newall as counsel for appellantOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
08/27/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/30/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/08/2010Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk re record, will be put in mail. Delay in compiling record.EventPhone CallFinal
09/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court clerkNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/10/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/14/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/05/2010Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
10/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - motion to vacate oral argument.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/08/2010Order - Vacating setting for oral argument. Argument will be rescheduled in December.OrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
11/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stephenson Emery for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tony Vehar for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/08/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (V. Anthony Vehar for appellant; Stephenson D. Emery for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/08/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/31/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/18/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/18/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/25/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/22/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal