judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EICON VS. NUNN

Case Information: 33600
Short Caption:EICON VS. NUNNCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A386433Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/1999 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00213
01/22/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/25/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00467
03/08/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice. 99-01607
03/16/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 99-01904
03/16/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.