judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYREESE L. WIGGINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0466
Short Caption:TYREESE L. WIGGINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-14873-10Filed Date:04/14/2011

Opening Event Date:04/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/24/2012
Argued/Submitted:06/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/23/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyreese L. Wiggins YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth H. DanelloYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/29/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Dennis Hart, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/29/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Dennis Hart, Esquire
05/31/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ORDERED/NEDED (pii))
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (180 pgs/Ronan) 2/8-9/11 proc.
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (51 pgs/Swaringer) 2/16/11 proc.
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (192 pgs/Lindsay) 2/22-23/11 proc.
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (8 pgs/Shelton) 2/24/11 proc. w/cd
07/06/2011RECORD INDEX
07/06/2011RECORD COPIES
07/06/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/20/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/29/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
09/02/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix.
10/18/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion w/in 15 days.
11/08/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
12/01/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to file appellant's brief and limited appendix.
12/01/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee motion for extension of time to file brief to 1/25/12.
12/01/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/01/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
01/24/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/24/2012FiledBriefing Completed
02/15/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
04/05/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
04/09/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
05/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
06/12/2012FiledArgued Before Judge Thompson,Easterly,Nebeker. Dennis M. Hart Esq.,for appellant, Elizabeth H. Danello Esq.,for appellee.
06/27/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
07/23/2012FiledMandate
07/30/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)