judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY YOUNG V. MICHAEL G. HOEHN

Case Information: 11-CV-0473
Short Caption:ANTHONY YOUNG V. MICHAEL G. HOEHNClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5648-09Filed Date:04/12/2011

Opening Event Date:04/12/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/27/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:12/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/02/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/03/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony Young Y
Stephen Thomas YelvertonYN
AppelleeMichael G. HoehnNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/12/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/27/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 12, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
05/17/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (all transcripts have been ordered) *(does not indicate proceeding dates requested) (elp) ** PER WTTS THE PROCEEDINGS DATE REQUESTED ARE 1/4/11, 1/5/11 & 1/6/11) (elp)
07/27/2011FiledSupplemental Record #1 (195-pgs/price 1/4/11 proc.)
07/27/2011FiledSupplemental Record #2 (264-pgs/price 1/5/11 proc)
07/27/2011FiledSupplemental Record #3 (106-pgs/price 1/6/11 proc.)
07/27/2011FiledSupplemental Record #4 (30-pgs/tape 1/6/11 proc.)w/cd
07/27/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/28/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/15/2011FiledRecord Index
09/06/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave within 15 days from the date of the order
09/29/2011FiledAnswer/Response to court order 9/14/11 (Appellant)
10/03/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/05/2011FiledOrder directing appellee's brief to be filed within 30 days from the date of this order
10/25/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee)Denied
11/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
11/02/2011FiledOpposition to aple's motion for extension of time (Appellant)
11/07/2011FiledOpposition - to aple's motion to dismiss (Appellant)
11/07/2011FiledAnswer/Response to aplt's opposition to motion for ext of time (Appellant)
11/14/2011FiledReply to aplt's response to motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to strike (Appellee)
11/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) and denying appellee's motion to dismiss
11/15/2011FiledMotion for leave to strike reply of aple (Hoehn) (Appellant)Denied
11/28/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion for leave to strike reply of aple (Hoehn) (Appellant)and denying Appellee's Motion to dismiss or in the alternative strike appellant's brief is denied and directing appellee's brief to be filed within 30 day from the date of the order
12/28/2011FiledBrief (Appelle)
12/28/2011FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellee)
12/28/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/13/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
02/01/2012FiledMotion To Strike certain portions of the appellant's reply brief (Appellee)Held in Abeyance
02/03/2012FiledOpposition to appllee's motion to strike. (Appellant)
02/10/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/21/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte holding motion to strike and opposition in abeyance and referring to the merits panel upon assignment.
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/02/2012FiledArgued before Judges Oberly, Easterly, Reid Stephen Thomas Yelverton, Esq. for appellant Michael G. Hoehn, Pro Se for appellee
05/03/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
05/22/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge.)
06/05/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing (Appellant)Denied
06/26/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing.
07/03/2012FiledMandate