judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SANCHEZ (MARCO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33604
Short Caption:SANCHEZ (MARCO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42720 , 63808
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C142877Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/17/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00234
03/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33353, 33491, 33566, 33580, 33582, 33604, 33605, 33727. 99-01428
06/17/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 99-05248
06/17/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/30/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn14[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-09440
06/25/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-09499
06/25/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/03/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 27, 2002. 02-09499