judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AARON ADRIAN GOMEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0257)
Case Number:S-11-0257Case Docketed On:11/02/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:AARON ADRIAN GOMEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:AARON ADRIAN GOMEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAaron Adrian GomezDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/02/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/19/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/20/2011Order - Grant - extension of time to file brief of AppellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/30/2011Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
01/03/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/03/2012Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
01/03/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal