judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUCKING CHUTES, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company v. RENO BROWN

Case Heading (S-11-0256)
Case Number:S-11-0256Case Docketed On:10/31/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:BUCKING CHUTES, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company v. RENO BROWN
Full Title:BUCKING CHUTES, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company, Appellant (Defendant), v. RENO BROWN, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBucking Chutes, LLCBrandon Lee Jensen
AppelleeReno BrownGlenn W. Myers

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/31/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/31/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/31/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/09/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Briefing ScheduleEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/13/2011Order - Grant - extension of time to file Appellant's BriefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/09/2012Motion - Extension of time - brief (Appellee opposes motion)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/10/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/14/2012Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
02/16/2012Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
02/16/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal