judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BLACK VS. ANDERSON

Case Information: 33603
Short Caption:BLACK VS. ANDERSONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A329417Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/1999 / Singer, MichaelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Greenman Goldberg Raby & Martinez--CHECK NO. 36660.
01/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00233
01/22/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael H. Singer. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/25/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00462
01/25/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 11/16/98, 12/9/98, 12/11/98, 12/14/98, 12/15/98 and 12/17/98. To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith, Kris Johnson and Chris Fulker. 99-00463
03/11/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-01761
03/11/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 99-01762
03/11/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-01763
03/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 99-01988
03/19/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.