judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

SNELLING MOTOR CO., FORD MOTOR CO. v. IRENE S. HENDERSON, ET VIR

Case: B-4332
B-4332
12/06/1973
Application for Writ of Error
SNELLING MOTOR CO., FORD MOTOR CO.
IRENE S. HENDERSON, ET VIR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/17/1975Letter brief Respondent
01/15/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
01/13/1975Response to Brief filedPetitioner
01/06/1975Errata FiledRespondent
12/31/1974Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/12/1974Letter brief Respondent
12/05/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/09/1974Letter brief Respondent
06/05/1974Response to Reply filedPetitioner
06/03/1974Response to Brief filedRespondent
05/09/1974Post submission brief filedPetitioner
04/24/1974Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
12/19/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
12/06/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
12/06/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/19/1975Dissenting opinion issued.
01/17/1975Letter brief
01/15/1975Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/13/1975Response to Brief filed
01/06/1975Errata Filed
12/31/1974Brief on the Merits
12/12/1974Letter brief
12/10/1974Response to Motion filed
12/05/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/20/1974Dissenting opinion issued.
11/20/1974Opinion issued
07/09/1974Letter brief
06/05/1974Response to Reply filed
06/03/1974Response to Brief filed
05/14/1974Letter Filed
05/09/1974Post submission brief filed
04/24/1974Supplemental Brief filed
03/13/1974Document received (See Remarks)
03/13/1974Document received (See Remarks)
03/13/1974Document received (See Remarks)
03/13/1974Document received (See Remarks)
03/13/1974Document received (See Remarks)
12/19/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/06/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/06/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/06/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Snelling Motor Co.Petitioner
Ford Motor Co.Petitioner
Irene S. Henderson, et virRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information