judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LYONS (PHILLIP) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38454
Short Caption:LYONS (PHILLIP) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35151 , 43287 , 44045 , 46520 , 48269 , 50002 , 54231 , 54598 , 55760 , 56523 , 58206 , 62569 , 62837
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C097533Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/16/2004How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/11/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-15282
10/05/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 18, 2001 and August 1, 2001. To Court Reporter: Dina Dalton. 01-16790
11/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement . Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-18947
01/18/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-01284
02/06/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed January 18, 2002. The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement received on January 18, 2002. 02-02444
02/06/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 02-01285
02/13/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 18, 2001 and August 1, 2001. To Court Reporter: Dina Dalton (same request as filed on 10/05/01). 02-02869
02/20/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, Ms. Dalton has not filed the requested transcripts. Ms. Dalton shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcripts for proceedings conducted on June 18, 2001, and August 1, 2001. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcripts, Ms. Dalton shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcripts cannot be produced, Ms. Dalton, shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 02-03250
07/08/2002MotionFiled Motion. Notice of Court Reporter Non-Compliance and Motion to Set New Briefing Schedule. 02-11598
07/22/2002MotionFiled Motion. Amended Notice of Court Reporter Non-Compliance and Motion to Set New Briefing Schedule. 02-12507
08/29/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, Ms. Dalton has not filed the requested transcripts. Ms. Dalton shall have 15 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcripts for the proceedings conducted on June 18, 2001, and August 1, 2001. We caution Ms. Dalton that failure to timely comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. On July 8, 2002, and July 22, 2002, respectively, appellant file a motion and an amended motion to set a new briefing schedule. Cause appearing, we grant the motion. Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-15000
01/17/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/18/01 and 8/10/01. Court Reporter: Dina Dalton. 03-00943
01/24/2003Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Dina Dalton regarding payment for transcripts. Nos. 38454, 38665, 39502 & 39568. 03-01361
03/12/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Gary Gowen. 03-04149
07/08/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has failed to file the opening brief and appendix or otherwise communicate with this court. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel for appellant. 03-11376
07/15/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Gary E. Gowen. 03-11946
08/11/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Enlarge the Time Within Which Appellant Must File His Opening Brief. 03-13360
08/18/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-13729
08/28/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-14536
09/23/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. and Filing Opening Brief and Appendix. We grant the 3 unopposed motions. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix received on September 2, 2003. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of respondent's answering brief to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. We caution appellant that this court may treat the failure to timely file a reply brief as a waiver of the right to file a reply brief. 03-15862
09/23/2003BriefFiled Opening Brief. 03-14719
09/23/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 03-14720
10/24/2003BriefFiled Answering Brief. 03-17811
12/08/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-20421
12/23/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has not submitted a reply brief. Because appellant did not submit the reply brief within the time requested, we deny the motion. Appellant shall have10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the reply brief. Failure to file a timely reply brief may be treated as a waiver of the right to file a Reply Brief. 03-21396
01/16/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed.
01/16/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-01033
01/21/2004BriefReceived Reply Brief. 04-01210
01/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed January 16, 2004. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief provisionally received in this court on January 21, 2004. 04-01275
01/22/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-01210
04/14/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-06840
04/26/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-07662
05/10/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed April 26, 2004. Appellant shall have until May 21, 2004, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. In the event appellant does not file a petition for rehearing by May 21, 2004, the clerk shall issue the remittitur on May 28, 2004. See NRAP 41(a). 04-08600
05/21/2004Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 04-09492
06/09/2004Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-10701
07/06/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-11409
07/06/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/30/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 9, 2004. 04-11409