judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PETER AMSCHEL v. STEVEN R. CRANFILL, JUDGE OF THE FOURTH DISTRICT COURT

Case Heading (S-10-0096)
Case Number:S-10-0096Case Docketed On:04/28/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:PETER AMSCHEL v. STEVEN R. CRANFILL, JUDGE OF THE FOURTH DISTRICT COURT
Full Title:PETER AMSCHEL, Petitioner, v. STEVEN R. CRANFILL, JUDGE OF THE FOURTH DISTRICT COURT, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerPeter Amschel Pro Se
RespondentSteven R. CranfillBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/28/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/28/2010Petition - Writ - prohibitionPetitionWrit - prohibitionFinal
04/28/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Other - Copy of Petition sent to Wyoming Attorney GeneralNotice-OutgoingOtherFinal
04/29/2010Event - Phone Call. Received call from Jay Gilbertz, counsel for the estate of Mary McEwan, inquiring if he was expected to respond. Since estate is not named in the petition, he will not.EventPhone CallFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Copy of "Challenge for Cause" filed in trial courtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
05/11/2010Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
05/11/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Response of Judge Cranfill to petition for writ of prohibition or other extraordinary relief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/19/2010Order - Petition for review (Prohibition) - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
05/19/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal