judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: DAVID WYLER; D.C. DEPT. OF MENTAL HEALTH, APLT

Case Information: 11-FM-0452
Short Caption:IN RE: DAVID WYLER; D.C. DEPT. OF MENTAL HEALTH, APLTClassification:Appeals - Family - Mental Health
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:MHE244-11Filed Date:03/31/2011

Opening Event Date:03/31/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/03/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/13/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantD.C. Department of Mental HealthN
Rosamund HolderNN
Holly M. JohnsonYY
AppelleeDavid Wyler Y
James W. KleinNY
Mikel Meredith WeidmanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/31/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/27/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (26 pgs/tape) 3/2/11 proc. w/cd
04/29/2011RECORD INDEX
04/29/2011RECORD COPIES
05/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellee has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellee in this appeal. It is (MORE)
05/11/2011 ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
06/23/2011 On consideration of this court's order of May 11, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (JAC)
07/12/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File (Appellant)
07/26/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to file lodged brief and limited appendix
07/26/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/26/2011FiledJoint Appendix (Appellant)
08/16/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
08/25/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 9/16/11
08/30/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal for lack of jurisdiction or in the alternative, for SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (Appellee) *****FILED AS APPELLEE'S BRIEFDenied
08/31/2011FiledTMC-MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE OR TO DISMISS/OPPO/REPLY/probable cause order
09/13/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellant)Granted
09/20/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET UNTIL OCTOBER 13, 2011
10/13/2011FiledOpposition to aple's moton to dismiss or summary affirmance (Appellant) *****FILED AS APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
10/24/2011FiledReply to the District's oppo to aple's motion to dismiss or for summary affirmance (Appellee)
11/22/2011FiledORDER DENYING APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS and FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and the CLERK SHALL FILE THE MOTION AS APPELLEE'S BRIEF and the OPPOSITION AS THE REPLY BRIEF...
11/22/2011FiledBrief -SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE FILED AS THE BRIEF PER 11/22/11 ORDER (Appellee)
11/22/2011FiledReply Brief - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS FILED AS THE REPLY BRIEF PER 11/22/11 ORDER (Appellant)
11/22/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/22/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
02/17/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/03/2012FiledArgued before Judges Washington, Glickman, Fisher
06/21/2012FiledDismissed (OPINION) (Washington, Chief Judge, and Glickman and Fisher, Associate Judges.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the appeal is dismissed as moot.)
07/13/2012FiledMandate