judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACKMAN CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. TOWN OF BAGGS, WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0252)
Case Number:S-11-0252Case Docketed On:10/27/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:JACKMAN CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. TOWN OF BAGGS, WYOMING
Full Title:JACKMAN CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. TOWN OF BAGGS, WYOMING, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJackman Construction, Inc., a Wyoming corporationClark D. Stith
AppelleeTown of Baggs, WyomingThomas A. Thompson
Matthew Edward Riehl

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts
Opinion Number:2012 WY 80
Citation:278 P.3d 247

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/27/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/27/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
10/27/2011Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
10/27/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/02/2011Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
12/14/2011Brief - Appellant and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
12/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/25/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/27/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/07/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/08/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Matthew E. Riehl obo Town of BaggsNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/13/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Clark Stith obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/14/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/23/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes, (Volumes I - III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcript)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/15/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Clark D. Stith for Appellant; Matthew Edward Riehl and Thomas A. Thompson, argument by Mr. Riehl) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/15/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/12/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/19/2012Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
06/21/2012Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellee re costs, mandate will award costs.EventPhone CallFinal
06/25/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of submission of costs pursuant to Wyo. R. App. P. 10.005; and received proposed order (no action taken, costs will be awarded in mandate)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/28/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/28/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/28/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/28/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/02/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/29/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal